+ − Summary
+ − Full Texts (3)
+ − Actions (32)
On May 14, 2015 in the Senate:
- Effective date 7/24/2015.
- Chapter 256, 2015 Laws.
- Governor signed.
On April 23, 2015 in the Senate:
- Delivered to Governor.
- President signed.
On April 22, 2015 in the Senate:
- Speaker signed.
On April 20, 2015 in the Senate:
- Passed final passage; yeas, 95; nays, 0; absent, 0; excused, 3.
- House concurred in Senate amendments.
On April 3, 2015 in the Senate:
- Rules suspended. Placed on Third Reading.
- Committee amendment adopted with no other amendments.
- Third reading, passed; yeas, 48; nays, 1; absent, 0; excused, 0.
On April 2, 2015 in the Senate:
- Placed on second reading by Rules Committee.
- Passed to Rules Committee for second reading.
- WM - Majority; do pass 1st substitute bill proposed by Health Care.
On April 1, 2015 in the Senate:
- Executive action taken in the Senate Committee on Ways & Means at 1:00 PM.
On March 31, 2015 in the Senate:
- Public hearing in the Senate Committee on Ways & Means at 3:30 PM.
On March 27, 2015 in the Senate:
- HLTH - Majority; do pass with amendment(s).
- Referred to Ways & Means.
- And refer to Ways & Means.
On March 26, 2015 in the Senate:
- Executive action taken in the Senate Committee on Health Care at 10:00 AM.
On March 19, 2015 in the Senate:
- Public hearing in the Senate Committee on Health Care at 10:00 AM.
On March 11, 2015 in the Senate:
- First reading, referred to Health Care.
On March 9, 2015 in the House:
- Third reading, passed; yeas, 98; nays, 0; absent, 0; excused, 0.
- Rules suspended. Placed on Third Reading.
On March 5, 2015 in the House:
- Rules Committee relieved of further consideration. Placed on second reading.
On February 27, 2015 in the House:
- Referred to Rules 2 Review.
On February 25, 2015 in the House:
- APP - Majority; do pass.
- Executive action taken in the House Committee on Appropriations at 1:30 PM.
On February 18, 2015 in the House:
- Public hearing in the House Committee on Appropriations at 3:30 PM.
On February 4, 2015 in the House:
- Referred to Appropriations.
- Committee relieved of further consideration.
On January 26, 2015 in the House:
- First reading, referred to Health Care & Wellness (Not Officially read and referred until adoption of Introduction report).
+ − Amendment
1652 AMS HLTH S2803.1
ADOPTED 04/03/2015
+ − Sponsors (2)
Type:
Primary Sponsor