+ − Full Texts (4)
+ − Actions (27)
On March 24, 2022 in the Senate:
- Effective date 6/9/2022.
- Chapter 120, 2022 Laws. (View Session Law)
- Governor signed.
On March 10, 2022 in the Senate:
- Delivered to Governor. (View Bill as Passed Legislature)
- President signed.
On March 8, 2022 in the House:
- Speaker signed.
On March 7, 2022 in the House:
- Passed final passage; yeas, 98; nays, 0; absent, 0; excused, 0. (View Roll Calls)
- House concurred in Senate amendments.
On February 25, 2022 in the Senate:
- Third reading, passed; yeas, 49; nays, 0; absent, 0; excused, 0. (View Roll Calls)
- Rules suspended. Placed on Third Reading.
- Committee amendment(s) adopted with no other amendments.
On February 24, 2022 in the Senate:
- Placed on second reading by Rules Committee.
On February 21, 2022 in the Senate:
- Passed to Rules Committee for second reading.
On February 18, 2022 in the Senate:
- HLTC - Majority; do pass with amendment(s). (Majority Report)
- Executive action taken in the Senate Committee on Health & Long Term Care at 8:00 AM. (Committee Materials)
On February 16, 2022 in the Senate:
- Public hearing in the Senate Committee on Health & Long Term Care at 8:00 AM. (Committee Materials)
On February 1, 2022 in the Senate:
- First reading, referred to Health & Long Term Care.
On January 26, 2022 in the House:
- Third reading, passed; yeas, 97; nays, 0; absent, 0; excused, 1. (View Roll Calls)
- Rules suspended. Placed on Third Reading.
- 1st substitute bill substituted (HCW 22). (View 1st Substitute)
On January 25, 2022 in the House:
- Rules Committee relieved of further consideration. Placed on second reading.
On January 21, 2022 in the House:
- Referred to Rules 2 Review.
On January 19, 2022 in the House:
- HCW - Majority; 1st substitute bill be substituted, do pass. (View 1st Substitute) (Majority Report)
- Executive action taken in the House Committee on Health Care & Wellness at 8:00 AM. (Committee Materials)
On January 10, 2022 in the House:
- Public hearing in the House Committee on Health Care & Wellness at 1:30 PM. (Committee Materials)
- First reading, referred to Health Care & Wellness. (View Original Bill)
On December 15, 2021 in the House:
- Prefiled for introduction.
+ − Sponsors (17)
Type:
Primary Sponsor