+ − Summaries (2)
+ − Full Texts (3)
+ − Actions (22)
On April 24, 2015 in the Senate:
- On Concurrence Calendar. Referred to House Rules 3.
On April 15, 2015 in the Senate:
- Rules suspended. Placed on Third Reading.
- Floor amendment(s) adopted.
- Third reading, passed; yeas, 43; nays, 4; absent, 0; excused, 2.
On April 7, 2015 in the Senate:
- Placed on second reading by Rules Committee.
On April 1, 2015 in the Senate:
- Passed to Rules Committee for second reading.
On March 31, 2015 in the Senate:
- Minority; without recommendation.
- LAW - Majority; do pass.
- Executive action taken in the Senate Committee on Law & Justice at 8:00 AM.
On March 17, 2015 in the Senate:
- Public hearing in the Senate Committee on Law & Justice at 8:00 AM.
On March 6, 2015 in the Senate:
- First reading, referred to Law & Justice.
On March 4, 2015 in the House:
- 1st substitute bill substituted (PS 15).
- Third reading, passed; yeas, 73; nays, 25; absent, 0; excused, 0.
- Floor amendment(s) adopted.
- Rules suspended. Placed on Third Reading.
On February 27, 2015 in the House:
- Placed on second reading by Rules Committee.
On February 17, 2015 in the House:
- Referred to Rules 2 Review.
On February 13, 2015 in the House:
- Minority; do not pass.
- PS - Majority; 1st substitute bill be substituted, do pass.
- Executive action taken in the House Committee on Public Safety at 10:00 AM.
On February 4, 2015 in the House:
- Public hearing in the House Committee on Public Safety at 1:30 PM.
On January 26, 2015 in the House:
- First reading, referred to Public Safety (Not Officially read and referred until adoption of Introduction report).
+ − Amendments (4)
1639-S.E AMS CHAS S3035.1
WITHDRAWN 04/15/2015
1639-S.E AMS HARG S3062.2
ADOPTED 04/15/2015
1639-S.E AMS CHAS S3033.1
WITHDRAWN 04/15/2015
1639-S AMH TAYL H2194.1
ADOPTED 03/04/2015
+ − Sponsors (17)
Type:
Primary Sponsor