+ − Summaries (2)
+ − Full Texts (5)
+ − Actions (25)
On July 3, 2013 in the Senate:
- Effective date 7/28/2013***.
- Chapter 23, 2013 Laws 2nd Special Session.
- Governor signed.
On June 29, 2013 in the Senate:
- Delivered to Governor.
- President signed.
- Speaker signed.
- Third reading, passed; yeas, 39; nays, 5; absent, 0; excused, 5.
- Rules suspended. Placed on Third Reading.
- Read first time, rules suspended, and placed on second reading calendar.
On June 28, 2013 in the House:
- Rules Committee relieved of further consideration. Placed on second reading.
- 1st substitute bill substituted (TR 13).
- Floor amendment(s) adopted.
- Rules suspended. Placed on Third Reading.
- Third reading, passed; yeas, 81; nays, 11; absent, 0; excused, 5.
On May 13, 2013 in the House:
- By resolution, reintroduced and retained in present status.
On March 13, 2013 in the House:
- Returned to Rules Committee for second reading.
On March 5, 2013 in the House:
- Placed on second reading by Rules Committee.
On March 1, 2013 in the House:
- Passed to Rules Committee for second reading.
On February 28, 2013 in the House:
- Minority; do not pass.
- TR - Majority; 1st substitute bill be substituted, do pass.
- TR - Executive action taken by committee.
- Executive action taken in the House Committee on Transportation at 1:30 PM.
On February 11, 2013 in the House:
- Public hearing in the House Committee on Transportation at 3:30 PM.
On February 4, 2013 in the House:
- First reading, referred to Transportation.
On February 1, 2013 in the House:
- Held on first reading.
+ − Amendments (3)
1632-S AMH RICC LONG 583
WITHDRAWN 06/28/2013
1632-S AMH RICC H2035.2
NOT CONSIDERED 06/28/2013
1632-S AMH BLAK H2664.3
ADOPTED 06/28/2013
+ − Sponsors (10)
Type:
Primary Sponsor