+ − Summaries (2)
+ − Full Texts (3)
+ − Actions (43)
On March 10, 2016 in the Senate:
- By resolution, reintroduced and retained in present status.
- By resolution, returned to House Rules Committee for third reading.
On March 8, 2016 in the Senate:
- Senate Rules "X" file.
On March 1, 2016 in the Senate:
- Placed on second reading by Rules Committee.
On February 26, 2016 in the Senate:
- Passed to Rules Committee for second reading.
- LAW - Majority; do pass with amendment(s).
- Public hearing and executive action taken in the Senate Committee on Law & Justice at 8:00 AM.
On February 16, 2016 in the Senate:
- First reading, referred to Law & Justice.
On February 12, 2016 in the Senate:
- 1st substitute bill substituted (PS 16).
- Rules suspended. Placed on Third Reading.
- Third reading, passed; yeas, 91; nays, 2; absent, 0; excused, 4.
On February 11, 2016 in the Senate:
- Placed on second reading by Rules Committee.
On February 9, 2016 in the Senate:
- Referred to Rules 2 Review.
On February 5, 2016 in the Senate:
- GGIT - Majority; do pass PS 16 bill proposed by Public Safety.
- Public hearing and executive action taken in the House Committee on General Government & Information Technology at 10:00 AM.
On February 2, 2016 in the Senate:
- Referred to General Government & Information Technology.
On January 29, 2016 in the Senate:
- PS - Majority; 1st substitute bill be substituted, do pass.
- Executive action taken in the House Committee on Public Safety at 10:00 AM.
On January 20, 2016 in the Senate:
- Public hearing in the House Committee on Public Safety at 1:30 PM.
On January 15, 2016 in the Senate:
- Public hearing in the House Committee on Public Safety at 10:00 AM.
On January 11, 2016 in the Senate:
- By resolution, reintroduced and retained in present status.
- Rules Committee relieved of further consideration.
- Referred to Public Safety.
On June 28, 2015 in the Senate:
- By resolution, reintroduced and retained in present status.
On May 29, 2015 in the Senate:
- By resolution, reintroduced and retained in present status.
On April 29, 2015 in the Senate:
- By resolution, reintroduced and retained in present status.
On April 24, 2015 in the Senate:
- By resolution, returned to House Rules Committee for third reading.
- Referred to Rules.
On April 14, 2015 in the Senate:
- Placed on second reading by Rules Committee.
On April 1, 2015 in the Senate:
- Passed to Rules Committee for second reading.
On March 31, 2015 in the Senate:
- LAW - Majority; do pass with amendment(s).
- Executive action taken in the Senate Committee on Law & Justice at 8:00 AM.
On March 16, 2015 in the Senate:
- Public hearing in the Senate Committee on Law & Justice at 1:30 PM.
On March 4, 2015 in the Senate:
- First reading, referred to Law & Justice.
On March 2, 2015 in the House:
- Third reading, passed; yeas, 97; nays, 0; absent, 0; excused, 1.
- Rules suspended. Placed on Third Reading.
- Floor amendment(s) adopted.
On February 27, 2015 in the House:
- Placed on second reading by Rules Committee.
On February 11, 2015 in the House:
- Referred to Rules 2 Review.
On February 6, 2015 in the House:
- PS - Majority; do pass.
- Executive action taken in the House Committee on Public Safety at 10:00 AM.
On January 30, 2015 in the House:
- Public hearing in the House Committee on Public Safety at 11:00 AM.
On January 23, 2015 in the House:
- First reading, referred to Public Safety (Not Officially read and referred until adoption of Introduction report).