+ − Full Texts (2)
+ − Actions (13)
On January 21, 2020 in the House:
- House Rules "X" file.
On January 13, 2020 in the House:
- By resolution, reintroduced and retained in present status.
On March 21, 2019 in the House:
- Referred to Rules 2 Consideration.
On March 7, 2019 in the House:
- Rules Committee relieved of further consideration. Placed on second reading.
On March 1, 2019 in the House:
- Referred to Rules 2 Review.
On February 28, 2019 in the House:
- APP - Majority; 1st substitute bill be substituted, do pass. (View 1st Substitute) (Majority Report)
- Executive action taken in the House Committee on Appropriations at 10:00 AM. (Committee Materials)
On February 27, 2019 in the House:
- Public hearing in the House Committee on Appropriations at 1:30 PM. (Committee Materials)
On February 14, 2019 in the House:
- Referred to Appropriations.
On February 8, 2019 in the House:
- HSEL - Majority; do pass. (Majority Report)
- Executive action taken in the House Committee on Human Services & Early Learning at 8:00 AM. (Committee Materials)
On February 5, 2019 in the House:
- Public hearing in the House Committee on Human Services & Early Learning at 1:30 PM. (Committee Materials)
On January 25, 2019 in the House:
- First reading, referred to Human Services & Early Learning. (View Original Bill)
+ − Sponsors (12)
Type:
Primary Sponsor