+ − Summaries (2)
+ − Full Texts (4)
+ − Actions (26)
On May 16, 2013 in the Senate:
- Effective date 7/28/2013.
- Chapter 259, 2013 Laws.
- Governor signed.
On April 23, 2013 in the Senate:
- Delivered to Governor.
On April 19, 2013 in the Senate:
- President signed.
On April 18, 2013 in the Senate:
- Speaker signed.
On April 17, 2013 in the Senate:
- Third reading, passed; yeas, 47; nays, 1; absent, 0; excused, 1.
- Rules suspended. Placed on Third Reading.
On April 16, 2013 in the Senate:
- Placed on second reading by Rules Committee.
On April 10, 2013 in the Senate:
- Made eligible to be placed on second reading.
On March 22, 2013 in the Senate:
- Passed to Rules Committee for second reading.
On March 21, 2013 in the Senate:
- HLTH - Majority; do pass.
- Executive action taken in the Senate Committee on Health Care at 10:00 AM.
On March 18, 2013 in the Senate:
- Public hearing in the Senate Committee on Health Care at 10:00 AM.
On March 7, 2013 in the Senate:
- First reading, referred to Health Care.
On March 5, 2013 in the House:
- Third reading, passed; yeas, 96; nays, 0; absent, 0; excused, 2.
- Rules suspended. Placed on Third Reading.
- 1st substitute bill substituted (HCW 13).
On March 1, 2013 in the House:
- Rules Committee relieved of further consideration. Placed on second reading.
On February 22, 2013 in the House:
- Passed to Rules Committee for second reading.
- HCW - Executive action taken by committee.
- HCW - Majority; 1st substitute bill be substituted, do pass.
- HCW - Executive action taken by committee.
- Executive action taken in the House Committee on Health Care & Wellness at 1:30 PM.
On February 12, 2013 in the House:
- Public hearing in the House Committee on Health Care & Wellness at 1:30 PM.
On February 1, 2013 in the House:
- First reading, referred to Health Care & Wellness.
+ − Sponsors (9)
Type:
Primary Sponsor