+ − Full Text
+ − Actions (31)
On March 8, 2018 in the Senate:
- By resolution, returned to House Rules Committee for third reading.
On February 28, 2018 in the Senate:
- Placed on second reading by Rules Committee.
On February 21, 2018 in the Senate:
- Passed to Rules Committee for second reading.
On February 20, 2018 in the Senate:
- Minority; without recommendation. (Minority Report)
- LGOV - Majority; do pass. (Majority Report)
- Executive action taken in the Senate Committee on Local Government at 1:30 PM. (Committee Materials)
On February 15, 2018 in the Senate:
- Public hearing in the Senate Committee on Local Government at 1:30 PM. (Committee Materials)
On February 2, 2018 in the Senate:
- First reading, referred to Local Government.
On January 31, 2018 in the House:
- Third reading, passed; yeas, 94; nays, 0; absent, 0; excused, 4. (View Roll Calls)
On January 16, 2018 in the House:
- Placed on third reading by Rules Committee.
On January 8, 2018 in the House:
- By resolution, reintroduced and retained in present status.
On June 21, 2017 in the House:
- By resolution, reintroduced and retained in present status.
On May 23, 2017 in the House:
- By resolution, reintroduced and retained in present status.
On April 24, 2017 in the House:
- By resolution, reintroduced and retained in present status.
On April 23, 2017 in the Senate:
- By resolution, returned to House Rules Committee for third reading.
On March 23, 2017 in the Senate:
- Passed to Rules Committee for second reading.
On March 22, 2017 in the Senate:
- Minority; without recommendation. (Minority Report)
- Minority; do not pass. (Minority Report)
- TRAN - Majority; do pass. (Majority Report)
- Executive action taken in the Senate Committee on Transportation at 3:30 PM. (Committee Materials)
On March 21, 2017 in the Senate:
- Executive session scheduled, but no action was taken in the Senate Committee on Transportation at 3:30 PM. (Committee Materials)
On March 14, 2017 in the Senate:
- Public hearing in the Senate Committee on Transportation at 3:30 PM. (Committee Materials)
On March 3, 2017 in the Senate:
- First reading, referred to Transportation.
On March 1, 2017 in the House:
- Third reading, passed; yeas, 98; nays, 0; absent, 0; excused, 0. (View Roll Calls)
- Rules suspended. Placed on Third Reading.
On February 14, 2017 in the House:
- Placed on second reading by Rules Committee.
On February 13, 2017 in the House:
- Referred to Rules 2 Review.
On February 8, 2017 in the House:
- TR - Majority; do pass. (Majority Report)
- Executive action taken in the House Committee on Transportation at 3:30 PM. (Committee Materials)
On February 6, 2017 in the House:
- Public hearing in the House Committee on Transportation at 3:30 PM. (Committee Materials)
On January 25, 2017 in the House:
- First reading, referred to Transportation (Not Officially read and referred until adoption of Introduction report). (View Original Bill)