+ − Full Text
+ − Actions (7)
On January 8, 2018 in the House:
- By resolution, reintroduced and retained in present status.
On June 21, 2017 in the House:
- By resolution, reintroduced and retained in present status.
On May 23, 2017 in the House:
- By resolution, reintroduced and retained in present status.
On April 24, 2017 in the House:
- By resolution, reintroduced and retained in present status.
On February 16, 2017 in the House:
- Executive session scheduled, but no action was taken in the House Committee on Commerce & Gaming at 8:30 AM. (Committee Materials)
On February 2, 2017 in the House:
- Public hearing in the House Committee on Commerce & Gaming at 9:00 AM. (Committee Materials)
On January 25, 2017 in the House:
- First reading, referred to Commerce & Gaming (Not Officially read and referred until adoption of Introduction report). (View Original Bill)