+ − Full Texts (4)
+ − Actions (27)
On May 16, 2017 in the House:
- Effective date 7/23/2017.
- Chapter 304, 2017 Laws. (View Session Law)
- Governor signed.
On April 21, 2017 in the Senate:
- Delivered to Governor. (View Bill as Passed Legislature)
On April 20, 2017 in the Senate:
- President signed.
On April 19, 2017 in the House:
- Speaker signed.
On April 17, 2017 in the House:
- Passed final passage; yeas, 80; nays, 18; absent, 0; excused, 0. (View Roll Calls)
- House concurred in Senate amendments.
On April 7, 2017 in the Senate:
- Third reading, passed; yeas, 43; nays, 4; absent, 0; excused, 2. (View Roll Calls)
- Rules suspended. Placed on Third Reading.
- Committee amendment(s) adopted with no other amendments.
On March 31, 2017 in the Senate:
- Placed on second reading by Rules Committee.
On March 29, 2017 in the Senate:
- Executive action taken in the Senate Committee on State Government at 8:00 AM. (Committee Materials)
- SGOV - Majority; do pass with amendment(s). (Majority Report)
- Passed to Rules Committee for second reading.
On March 15, 2017 in the Senate:
- Public hearing in the Senate Committee on State Government at 8:00 AM. (Committee Materials)
On March 7, 2017 in the Senate:
- First reading, referred to State Government.
On March 3, 2017 in the House:
- Third reading, passed; yeas, 75; nays, 22; absent, 0; excused, 1. (View 1st Engrossed) (View Roll Calls)
- Rules suspended. Placed on Third Reading.
- Floor amendment(s) adopted.
On March 1, 2017 in the House:
- Rules Committee relieved of further consideration. Placed on second reading.
On February 17, 2017 in the House:
- Referred to Rules 2 Review.
On February 14, 2017 in the House:
- Minority; without recommendation. (Minority Report)
- SEIT - Majority; do pass. (Majority Report)
- Executive action taken in the House Committee on State Government, Elections & Information Technology at 8:00 AM. (Committee Materials)
On February 10, 2017 in the House:
- Public hearing in the House Committee on State Government, Elections & Information Technology at 10:00 AM. (Committee Materials)
On January 25, 2017 in the House:
- First reading, referred to State Government (Not Officially read and referred until adoption of Introduction report). (View Original Bill)
+ − Sponsors (38)
Type:
Primary Sponsor