+ − Summaries (2)
+ − Full Texts (2)
+ − Actions (15)
On January 21, 2014 in the House:
- Public hearing in the House Committee on Community Development and Housing & Tribal Affairs at 1:30 PM.
On January 13, 2014 in the House:
- Referred to Community Development, Housing & Tribal Affairs.
- Rules Committee relieved of further consideration.
- By resolution, reintroduced and retained in present status.
On November 7, 2013 in the House:
- By resolution, reintroduced and retained in present status.
On May 13, 2013 in the House:
- By resolution, reintroduced and retained in present status.
On March 13, 2013 in the House:
- Returned to Rules Committee for second reading.
On March 1, 2013 in the House:
- Rules Committee relieved of further consideration. Placed on second reading.
On February 22, 2013 in the House:
- Passed to Rules Committee for second reading.
On February 20, 2013 in the House:
- Minority; do not pass.
- CDHT - Majority; 1st substitute bill be substituted, do pass.
- CDHT - Executive action taken by committee.
- Executive action taken in the House Committee on Community Development and Housing & Tribal Affairs at 8:00 AM.
On February 14, 2013 in the House:
- Public hearing in the House Committee on Community Development and Housing & Tribal Affairs at 1:30 PM.
On January 31, 2013 in the House:
- First reading, referred to Community Development, Housing & Tribal Affairs.
+ − Amendments (4)
+ − Sponsors (9)
Type:
Primary Sponsor