+ − Summary
+ − Full Text
+ − Actions (18)
On January 13, 2014 in the House:
- Referred to Local Government.
- By resolution, reintroduced and retained in present status.
- Rules Committee relieved of further consideration.
On November 7, 2013 in the House:
- By resolution, reintroduced and retained in present status.
On May 13, 2013 in the House:
- By resolution, reintroduced and retained in present status.
On March 1, 2013 in the House:
- Passed to Rules Committee for second reading.
On February 28, 2013 in the House:
- FIN - Executive action taken by committee.
- Executive action taken in the House Committee on Finance at 8:00 AM.
- FIN - Majority; do pass.
- Minority; without recommendation.
On February 26, 2013 in the House:
- Public hearing in the House Committee on Finance at 8:00 AM.
On February 22, 2013 in the House:
- Referred to Finance.
On February 21, 2013 in the House:
- Minority; do not pass.
- LG - Majority; do pass.
- LG - Executive action taken by committee.
- Executive action taken in the House Committee on Local Government at 8:00 AM.
On February 12, 2013 in the House:
- Public hearing in the House Committee on Local Government at 1:30 PM.
On January 31, 2013 in the House:
- First reading, referred to Local Government.