+ − Summaries (3)
+ − Full Texts (3)
+ − Actions (42)
On March 13, 2014 in the Senate:
- By resolution, returned to House Rules Committee for third reading.
On March 5, 2014 in the Senate:
- First reading, referred to Health Care.
On March 3, 2014 in the Senate:
- Third reading, passed; yeas, 66; nays, 31; absent, 0; excused, 1.
- Rules suspended. Placed on Third Reading.
- 2nd substitute bill substituted (APP 14).
On February 28, 2014 in the Senate:
- Rules Committee relieved of further consideration. Placed on second reading.
On February 18, 2014 in the Senate:
- Returned to Rules Committee for second reading.
On February 14, 2014 in the Senate:
- Rules Committee relieved of further consideration. Placed on second reading.
On February 5, 2014 in the Senate:
- Passed to Rules Committee for second reading.
On February 4, 2014 in the Senate:
- Executive action taken in the House Committee on Appropriations at 3:30 PM.
- Minority; do not pass.
- APP - Executive action taken by committee.
- APP - Majority; 2nd substitute bill be substituted, do pass.
On January 13, 2014 in the Senate:
- Referred to Appropriations.
- Rules Committee relieved of further consideration.
- By resolution, reintroduced and retained in present status.
On November 7, 2013 in the Senate:
- By resolution, reintroduced and retained in present status.
On May 13, 2013 in the Senate:
- By resolution, reintroduced and retained in present status.
On April 28, 2013 in the Senate:
- By resolution, returned to House Rules Committee for third reading.
On March 29, 2013 in the Senate:
- HLTH - Majority; do pass.
- And refer to Ways & Means.
- Referred to Ways & Means.
On March 28, 2013 in the Senate:
- Executive action taken in the Senate Committee on Health Care at 10:00 AM.
On March 18, 2013 in the Senate:
- Public hearing in the Senate Committee on Health Care at 10:00 AM.
On March 8, 2013 in the Senate:
- First reading, referred to Health Care.
On March 6, 2013 in the House:
- Third reading, passed; yeas, 69; nays, 28; absent, 0; excused, 1.
- Rules suspended. Placed on Third Reading.
- 1st substitute bill substituted (ELHS 13).
On March 5, 2013 in the House:
- Placed on second reading by Rules Committee.
On March 1, 2013 in the House:
- Passed to Rules Committee for second reading.
On February 27, 2013 in the House:
- Executive action taken in the House Committee on Appropriations at 1:30 PM.
- APP - Majority; do pass ELHS 13 bill proposed by Early Learning & Human Services.
- APP - Executive action taken by committee.
- Minority; do not pass.
On February 21, 2013 in the House:
- Public hearing in the House Committee on Appropriations at 3:30 PM.
On February 14, 2013 in the House:
- Referred to Appropriations.
On February 12, 2013 in the House:
- Minority; do not pass.
- ELHS - Majority; 1st substitute bill be substituted, do pass.
- ELHS - Executive action taken by committee.
- Executive action taken in the House Committee on Early Learning & Human Services at 1:30 PM.
On February 8, 2013 in the House:
- Public hearing in the House Committee on Early Learning & Human Services at 1:30 PM.
On January 31, 2013 in the House:
- First reading, referred to Early Learning & Human Services.