+ − Full Text
+ − Actions (9)
On January 13, 2020 in the House:
- By resolution, reintroduced and retained in present status.
On February 14, 2019 in the House:
- Referred to Appropriations.
On February 8, 2019 in the House:
- Minority; without recommendation. (Minority Report)
- Minority; do not pass. (Minority Report)
- CWD - Majority; do pass. (Majority Report)
- Executive action taken in the House Committee on College & Workforce Development at 8:30 AM. (Committee Materials)
On February 6, 2019 in the House:
- Executive session scheduled, but no action was taken in the House Committee on College & Workforce Development at 1:30 PM. (Committee Materials)
On January 30, 2019 in the House:
- Public hearing in the House Committee on College & Workforce Development at 1:30 PM. (Committee Materials)
On January 24, 2019 in the House:
- First reading, referred to College & Workforce Development. (View Original Bill)
+ − Sponsors (31)
Type:
Primary Sponsor