+ − Summaries (3)
+ − Full Texts (5)
+ − Actions (40)
On May 9, 2013 in the Senate:
- Effective date 7/28/2013.
On May 8, 2013 in the Senate:
- Chapter 182, 2013 Laws.
- Governor signed.
On April 25, 2013 in the Senate:
- Delivered to Governor.
On April 24, 2013 in the Senate:
- President signed.
On April 23, 2013 in the Senate:
- Speaker signed.
On April 22, 2013 in the Senate:
- Passed final passage; yeas, 83; nays, 12; absent, 0; excused, 3.
- House concurred in Senate amendments.
On April 17, 2013 in the Senate:
- Committee amendment adopted with no other amendments.
- Rules suspended. Placed on Third Reading.
- Third reading, passed; yeas, 47; nays, 1; absent, 0; excused, 1.
On April 12, 2013 in the Senate:
- Placed on second reading by Rules Committee.
On April 9, 2013 in the Senate:
- Passed to Rules Committee for second reading.
- Minority; without recommendation.
- WM - Majority; do pass with amendment(s).
- Executive action taken in the Senate Committee on Ways & Means at 1:30 PM.
On April 8, 2013 in the Senate:
- Public hearing in the Senate Committee on Ways & Means at 1:45 PM.
On April 2, 2013 in the Senate:
- Referred to Ways & Means.
On April 1, 2013 in the Senate:
- Executive action taken in the Senate Committee on Human Services & Corrections at 10:00 AM.
- HSC - Majority; do pass.
- And refer to Ways & Means.
On March 26, 2013 in the Senate:
- Public hearing in the Senate Committee on Human Services & Corrections at 10:00 AM.
On March 12, 2013 in the Senate:
- First reading, referred to Human Services & Corrections.
On March 8, 2013 in the House:
- Third reading, passed; yeas, 86; nays, 12; absent, 0; excused, 0.
- Rules suspended. Placed on Third Reading.
- 2nd substitute bill substituted (APP 13).
On March 5, 2013 in the House:
- Placed on second reading by Rules Committee.
On March 1, 2013 in the House:
- Executive action taken in the House Committee on Appropriations at 9:00 AM.
- APP - Executive action taken by committee.
- APP - Majority; 2nd substitute bill be substituted, do pass.
- Minority; do not pass.
- Passed to Rules Committee for second reading.
On February 28, 2013 in the House:
- Public hearing in the House Committee on Appropriations at 1:30 PM.
On February 21, 2013 in the House:
- Referred to Appropriations.
On February 19, 2013 in the House:
- Minority; do not pass.
- ELHS - Majority; 1st substitute bill be substituted, do pass.
- ELHS - Executive action taken by committee.
- Executive action taken in the House Committee on Early Learning & Human Services at 1:30 PM.
On February 12, 2013 in the House:
- Public hearing in the House Committee on Early Learning & Human Services at 1:30 PM.
On January 30, 2013 in the House:
- First reading, referred to Early Learning & Human Services.
+ − Amendment
1566-S2 AMS WM S2536.1
ADOPTED 04/17/2013