+ − Full Texts (2)
+ − Actions (11)
On January 13, 2020 in the House:
- By resolution, reintroduced and retained in present status.
On March 21, 2019 in the House:
- Referred to Rules 2 Consideration.
On March 1, 2019 in the House:
- Placed on second reading by Rules Committee.
On February 22, 2019 in the House:
- Referred to Rules 2 Review.
On February 21, 2019 in the House:
- Minority; do not pass. (Minority Report)
- ENVI - Majority; 1st substitute bill be substituted, do pass. (View 1st Substitute) (Majority Report)
- Executive action taken in the House Committee on Environment & Energy at 8:00 AM. (Committee Materials)
On February 19, 2019 in the House:
- Executive session scheduled, but no action was taken in the House Committee on Environment & Energy at 3:30 PM. (Committee Materials)
On February 14, 2019 in the House:
- Executive session scheduled, but no action was taken in the House Committee on Environment & Energy at 8:00 AM. (Committee Materials)
On January 31, 2019 in the House:
- Public hearing in the House Committee on Environment & Energy at 8:00 AM. (Committee Materials)
On January 24, 2019 in the House:
- First reading, referred to Environment & Energy. (View Original Bill)
+ − Sponsors (2)
Type:
Primary Sponsor