+ − Full Texts (2)
+ − Actions (11)
On January 13, 2020 in the House:
- By resolution, reintroduced and retained in present status.
On February 18, 2019 in the House:
- Referred to Appropriations.
On February 15, 2019 in the House:
- Minority; without recommendation. (Minority Report)
- Minority; do not pass. (Minority Report)
- CWD - Majority; 1st substitute bill be substituted, do pass. (View 1st Substitute) (Majority Report)
- Executive action taken in the House Committee on College & Workforce Development at 8:00 AM. (Committee Materials)
On February 13, 2019 in the House:
- Executive session scheduled, but no action was taken in the House Committee on College & Workforce Development at 1:30 PM. (Committee Materials)
On February 12, 2019 in the House:
- Executive session scheduled, but no action was taken in the House Committee on College & Workforce Development at 1:30 PM. (Committee Materials)
On February 8, 2019 in the House:
- Executive session scheduled, but no action was taken in the House Committee on College & Workforce Development at 8:30 AM. (Committee Materials)
On February 6, 2019 in the House:
- Public hearing in the House Committee on College & Workforce Development at 1:30 PM. (Committee Materials)
On January 23, 2019 in the House:
- First reading, referred to College & Workforce Development. (View Original Bill)