+ − Full Texts (2)
+ − Actions (8)
On January 13, 2020 in the House:
- By resolution, reintroduced and retained in present status.
On February 22, 2019 in the House:
- Referred to Rules 2 Review.
On February 21, 2019 in the House:
- Minority; do not pass. (Minority Report)
- PS - Majority; 1st substitute bill be substituted, do pass. (View 1st Substitute) (Majority Report)
- Executive action taken in the House Committee on Public Safety at 8:00 AM. (Committee Materials)
On February 7, 2019 in the House:
- Executive session scheduled, but no action was taken in the House Committee on Public Safety at 8:00 AM. (Committee Materials)
On January 29, 2019 in the House:
- Public hearing in the House Committee on Public Safety at 3:30 PM. (Committee Materials)
On January 23, 2019 in the House:
- First reading, referred to Public Safety. (View Original Bill)