+ − Full Texts (5)
+ − Actions (26)
On May 16, 2017 in the House:
- Effective date 7/23/2017.
- Chapter 302, 2017 Laws. (View Session Law)
- Governor signed.
On April 18, 2017 in the Senate:
- Delivered to Governor. (View Bill as Passed Legislature)
On April 17, 2017 in the Senate:
- President signed.
On April 14, 2017 in the House:
- Speaker signed.
On April 12, 2017 in the Senate:
- Third reading, passed; yeas, 34; nays, 15; absent, 0; excused, 0. (View Roll Calls)
- Rules suspended. Placed on Third Reading.
- Committee amendment not adopted.
On April 10, 2017 in the Senate:
- Placed on second reading by Rules Committee.
On March 13, 2017 in the Senate:
- Passed to Rules Committee for second reading.
On March 9, 2017 in the Senate:
- First reading, referred to Commerce, Labor & Sports.
- Executive action taken in the Senate Committee on Commerce, Labor & Sports at 1:30 PM. (Committee Materials)
- CLS - Majority; do pass with amendment(s). (Majority Report)
On March 7, 2017 in the House:
- Third reading, passed; yeas, 82; nays, 15; absent, 0; excused, 1. (View 1st Engrossed) (View Roll Calls)
- Rules suspended. Placed on Third Reading.
- Floor amendment(s) adopted.
- 1st substitute bill substituted (CB 17). (View 1st Substitute)
On February 24, 2017 in the House:
- Rules Committee relieved of further consideration. Placed on second reading.
On February 15, 2017 in the House:
- Referred to Rules 2 Review.
On February 10, 2017 in the House:
- Minority; without recommendation. (Minority Report)
- CB - Majority; 1st substitute bill be substituted, do pass. (View 1st Substitute) (Majority Report)
- Executive action taken in the House Committee on Capital Budget at 8:00 AM. (Committee Materials)
On February 7, 2017 in the House:
- Executive session scheduled, but no action was taken in the House Committee on Capital Budget at 3:30 PM. (Committee Materials)
On February 3, 2017 in the House:
- Public hearing in the House Committee on Capital Budget at 8:00 AM. (Committee Materials)
On January 23, 2017 in the House:
- First reading, referred to Capital Budget (Not Officially read and referred until adoption of Introduction report). (View Original Bill)