+ − Summaries (2)
+ − Full Texts (2)
+ − Actions (21)
On March 13, 2014 in the Senate:
- By resolution, returned to House Rules Committee for third reading.
On January 23, 2014 in the Senate:
- First reading, referred to Higher Education.
On January 22, 2014 in the Senate:
- Third reading, passed; yeas, 58; nays, 39; absent, 0; excused, 1.
On January 20, 2014 in the Senate:
- Placed on third reading by Rules Committee.
On January 13, 2014 in the Senate:
- By resolution, reintroduced and retained in present status.
On November 7, 2013 in the Senate:
- By resolution, reintroduced and retained in present status.
On May 13, 2013 in the Senate:
- By resolution, reintroduced and retained in present status.
On April 28, 2013 in the Senate:
- By resolution, returned to House Rules Committee for third reading.
On March 6, 2013 in the Senate:
- First reading, referred to Higher Education.
On March 4, 2013 in the House:
- 1st substitute bill substituted (HE 13).
- Rules suspended. Placed on Third Reading.
- Third reading, passed; yeas, 58; nays, 40; absent, 0; excused, 0.
On March 1, 2013 in the House:
- Rules Committee relieved of further consideration. Placed on second reading.
On February 22, 2013 in the House:
- Made eligible to be placed on second reading.
On February 18, 2013 in the House:
- Passed to Rules Committee for second reading.
On February 15, 2013 in the House:
- Minority; do not pass.
On February 14, 2013 in the House:
- HE - Majority; 1st substitute bill be substituted, do pass.
- HE - Executive action taken by committee.
- Executive action taken in the House Committee on Higher Education at 10:00 AM.
On February 13, 2013 in the House:
- Public hearing in the House Committee on Higher Education at 1:30 PM.
On January 30, 2013 in the House:
- First reading, referred to Higher Education.
+ − Sponsors (23)
Type:
Primary Sponsor