+ − Full Text
+ − Actions (10)
On January 10, 2022 in the House:
- By resolution, reintroduced and retained in present status.
On March 10, 2021 in the House:
- Returned to Rules Committee for second reading.
On March 2, 2021 in the House:
- Rules Committee relieved of further consideration. Placed on second reading.
On February 22, 2021 in the House:
- Referred to Rules 2 Review.
- Minority; without recommendation. (Minority Report)
- Minority; do not pass. (Minority Report)
- TR - Majority; do pass. (Majority Report)
- Executive action taken in the House Committee on Transportation at 1:30 PM. (Committee Materials)
On February 17, 2021 in the House:
- Public hearing in the House Committee on Transportation at 2:30 PM. (Committee Materials)
On February 11, 2021 in the House:
- First reading, referred to Transportation. (View Original Bill)
+ − Sponsors (2)
Type:
Primary Sponsor