+ − Full Texts (2)
+ − Actions (13)
On January 10, 2022 in the House:
- House Rules "X" file.
On April 25, 2021 in the Senate:
- By resolution, returned to House Rules Committee for third reading.
On March 16, 2021 in the Senate:
- Public hearing in the Senate Committee on Transportation at 4:00 PM. (Committee Materials)
On March 2, 2021 in the Senate:
- First reading, referred to Transportation.
On February 26, 2021 in the House:
- Third reading, passed; yeas, 95; nays, 0; absent, 0; excused, 3. (View Roll Calls)
- Rules suspended. Placed on Third Reading.
- 1st substitute bill substituted (TR 21). (View 1st Substitute)
On February 25, 2021 in the House:
- Rules Committee relieved of further consideration. Placed on second reading.
On February 22, 2021 in the House:
- Referred to Rules 2 Review.
- TR - Majority; 1st substitute bill be substituted, do pass. (View 1st Substitute) (Majority Report)
- Executive action taken in the House Committee on Transportation at 1:30 PM. (Committee Materials)
On February 17, 2021 in the House:
- Public hearing in the House Committee on Transportation at 2:30 PM. (Committee Materials)
On February 8, 2021 in the House:
- First reading, referred to Transportation. (View Original Bill)