+ − Full Texts (6)
+ − Actions (71)
On March 21, 2018 in the Senate:
- Effective date 6/7/2018.
- Governor signed.
- Chapter 116, 2018 Laws. (View Session Law)
On March 8, 2018 in the Senate:
- Delivered to Governor. (View Bill as Passed Legislature)
- President signed.
On March 8, 2018 in the House:
- Speaker signed.
On March 7, 2018 in the House:
- Passed final passage as recommended by conference committee; yeas, 70; nays, 28; absent, 0; excused, 0. (View Roll Calls)
- Conference committee report adopted.
On March 6, 2018 in the Senate:
- Conference committee report; received 11:10 AM 3/6/2018.
- Passed final passage as recommended by conference committee; yeas, 36; nays, 12; absent, 0; excused, 1. (View Roll Calls)
On March 6, 2018 in the House:
- Conference committee report; received 11:20 AM 3/6/2018.
On March 6, 2018 in the Senate:
- Conference committee report adopted.
On March 5, 2018 in the Senate:
- Conference committee appointed. Senators Keiser, Baumgartner, Cleveland.
- Conference committee request granted.
On March 3, 2018 in the House:
- Conference committee appointed. Representatives Sells, Senn, McCabe.
- House refuses to concur in the Senate amendments. Asks Senate for Conference thereon.
On March 1, 2018 in the Senate:
- Floor amendment(s) adopted.
- Rules suspended. Placed on Third Reading.
- Third reading, passed; yeas, 37; nays, 12; absent, 0; excused, 0. (View Roll Calls)
On February 8, 2018 in the Senate:
- Placed on second reading by Rules Committee.
- Passed to Rules Committee for second reading.
On February 7, 2018 in the Senate:
- LBRC - Majority; do pass. (Majority Report)
- Executive action taken in the Senate Committee on Labor & Commerce at 9:00 AM. (Committee Materials)
On January 19, 2018 in the Senate:
- First reading, referred to Labor & Commerce.
On January 17, 2018 in the House:
- 2nd substitute bill substituted (LAWS 18). (View 2nd Substitute)
- Rules suspended. Placed on Third Reading.
- Third reading, passed; yeas, 69; nays, 28; absent, 0; excused, 1. (View Roll Calls)
On January 12, 2018 in the House:
- Placed on second reading.
On January 9, 2018 in the House:
- Minority; do not pass. (Minority Report)
- LAWS - Majority; 2nd substitute bill be substituted, do pass. (View 2nd Substitute) (Majority Report)
- Executive action taken in the House Committee on Labor & Workplace Standards at 1:30 PM. (Committee Materials)
On January 8, 2018 in the House:
- Public hearing in the House Committee on Labor & Workplace Standards at 1:30 PM. (Committee Materials)
- Referred to Labor & Workplace Standards.
- Rules Committee relieved of further consideration.
- By resolution, reintroduced and retained in present status.
On June 21, 2017 in the House:
- By resolution, reintroduced and retained in present status.
On June 21, 2017 in the Senate:
- By resolution, returned to House Rules Committee for third reading.
On May 29, 2017 in the Senate:
- First reading, referred to Commerce, Labor & Sports.
On May 25, 2017 in the House:
- Third reading, passed; yeas, 61; nays, 33; absent, 0; excused, 4. (View Roll Calls)
On May 23, 2017 in the House:
- Rules Committee relieved of further consideration. Placed on third reading.
- By resolution, reintroduced and retained in present status.
On May 23, 2017 in the Senate:
- By resolution, returned to House Rules Committee for third reading.
On May 5, 2017 in the Senate:
- First reading, referred to Commerce, Labor & Sports.
On May 2, 2017 in the House:
- Third reading, passed; yeas, 61; nays, 31; absent, 0; excused, 6. (View Roll Calls)
- Vote on third reading will be reconsidered.
- Third reading, passed; yeas, 61; nays, 31; absent, 0; excused, 6. (View Roll Calls)
On May 1, 2017 in the House:
- Rules Committee relieved of further consideration. Placed on third reading.
On April 24, 2017 in the House:
- By resolution, reintroduced and retained in present status.
On April 23, 2017 in the Senate:
- By resolution, returned to House Rules Committee for third reading.
On March 29, 2017 in the Senate:
- Passed to Rules Committee for second reading.
- CLS - Majority; do pass with amendment(s). (Majority Report)
- Executive action taken in the Senate Committee on Commerce, Labor & Sports at 3:15 PM. (Committee Materials)
On March 23, 2017 in the Senate:
- Executive session scheduled, but no action was taken in the Senate Committee on Commerce, Labor & Sports at 1:30 PM. (Committee Materials)
On March 10, 2017 in the Senate:
- First reading, referred to Commerce, Labor & Sports.
On March 8, 2017 in the House:
- Third reading, passed; yeas, 61; nays, 36; absent, 0; excused, 1. (View 1st Engrossed) (View Roll Calls)
- Floor amendment(s) adopted.
- 1st substitute bill not substituted. (View 1st Substitute)
- Rules suspended. Placed on Third Reading.
On March 3, 2017 in the House:
- Rules Committee relieved of further consideration. Placed on second reading.
On February 24, 2017 in the House:
- APP - Majority; 1st substitute bill be substituted, do pass. (View 1st Substitute) (Majority Report)
- Executive action taken in the House Committee on Appropriations at 10:00 AM. (Committee Materials)
- Minority; do not pass. (Minority Report)
- Referred to Rules 2 Review.
On February 16, 2017 in the House:
- Public hearing in the House Committee on Appropriations at 3:30 PM. (Committee Materials)
On February 2, 2017 in the House:
- Referred to Appropriations.
On January 30, 2017 in the House:
- Minority; without recommendation. (Minority Report)
- Minority; do not pass. (Minority Report)
- LAWS - Majority; do pass. (Majority Report)
- Executive action taken in the House Committee on Labor & Workplace Standards at 1:30 PM. (Committee Materials)
On January 24, 2017 in the House:
- Public hearing in the House Committee on Labor & Workplace Standards at 1:30 PM. (Committee Materials)
On January 23, 2017 in the House:
- First reading, referred to Labor & Workplace Standards (Not Officially read and referred until adoption of Introduction report). (View Original Bill)
+ − Sponsors (31)
Type:
Primary Sponsor