+ − Summaries (2)
+ − Full Texts (4)
+ − Actions (25)
On May 20, 2013 in the Senate:
- Effective date 7/28/2013.
- Chapter 292, 2013 Laws.
- Governor signed.
On April 23, 2013 in the Senate:
- Delivered to Governor.
On April 19, 2013 in the Senate:
- President signed.
On April 18, 2013 in the Senate:
- Speaker signed.
On April 16, 2013 in the Senate:
- Third reading, passed; yeas, 47; nays, 0; absent, 0; excused, 2.
- Rules suspended. Placed on Third Reading.
On April 15, 2013 in the Senate:
- Placed on second reading by Rules Committee.
On April 3, 2013 in the Senate:
- Passed to Rules Committee for second reading.
- EET - Majority; do pass.
On April 2, 2013 in the Senate:
- Executive action taken in the Senate Committee on Energy and Environment & Telecommunications at 1:30 PM.
On March 26, 2013 in the Senate:
- Public hearing in the Senate Committee on Energy and Environment & Telecommunications at 1:30 PM.
On March 8, 2013 in the Senate:
- First reading, referred to Energy, Environment & Telecommunications.
On March 6, 2013 in the House:
- Third reading, passed; yeas, 94; nays, 3; absent, 0; excused, 1.
- Rules suspended. Placed on Third Reading.
- 1st substitute bill substituted (ENVI 13).
On March 5, 2013 in the House:
- Placed on second reading by Rules Committee.
On February 21, 2013 in the House:
- Passed to Rules Committee for second reading.
On February 19, 2013 in the House:
- Minority; do not pass.
- ENVI - Majority; 1st substitute bill be substituted, do pass.
- ENVI - Executive action taken by committee.
- Executive action taken in the House Committee on Environment at 8:00 AM.
On February 7, 2013 in the House:
- Public hearing in the House Committee on Environment at 10:00 AM.
On January 29, 2013 in the House:
- First reading, referred to Environment.
+ − Sponsors (2)
Type:
Primary Sponsor