+ − Full Texts (2)
+ − Actions (14)
On January 8, 2018 in the House:
- Referred to Early Learning & Human Services.
- Rules Committee relieved of further consideration.
- By resolution, reintroduced and retained in present status.
On June 21, 2017 in the House:
- By resolution, reintroduced and retained in present status.
On May 23, 2017 in the House:
- By resolution, reintroduced and retained in present status.
On April 24, 2017 in the House:
- By resolution, reintroduced and retained in present status.
On February 15, 2017 in the House:
- Referred to Rules 2 Review.
On February 10, 2017 in the House:
- ELHS - Majority; 1st substitute bill be substituted, do pass. (View 1st Substitute) (Majority Report)
- Executive action taken in the House Committee on Early Learning & Human Services at 10:00 AM. (Committee Materials)
On February 1, 2017 in the House:
- Executive session scheduled, but no action was taken in the House Committee on Early Learning & Human Services at 1:30 PM. (Committee Materials)
On January 31, 2017 in the House:
- Public hearing in the House Committee on Early Learning & Human Services at 8:00 AM. (Committee Materials)
On January 23, 2017 in the House:
- Referred to Early Learning & Human Services.
- Committee relieved of further consideration.
On January 20, 2017 in the House:
- First reading, referred to Health Care & Wellness (Not Officially read and referred until adoption of Introduction report). (View Original Bill)