+ − Summary
+ − Full Text
+ − Actions (15)
On March 10, 2016 in the House:
- By resolution, reintroduced and retained in present status.
On January 11, 2016 in the House:
- Referred to Judiciary.
- Rules Committee relieved of further consideration.
- By resolution, reintroduced and retained in present status.
On June 28, 2015 in the House:
- By resolution, reintroduced and retained in present status.
On May 29, 2015 in the House:
- By resolution, reintroduced and retained in present status.
On April 29, 2015 in the House:
- By resolution, reintroduced and retained in present status.
On March 13, 2015 in the House:
- Returned to Rules Committee for second reading.
On March 3, 2015 in the House:
- Placed on second reading by Rules Committee.
On February 20, 2015 in the House:
- Referred to Rules 2 Review.
On February 19, 2015 in the House:
- Minority; do not pass.
- JUDI - Majority; do pass.
- Executive action taken in the House Committee on Judiciary at 12:30 PM.
On February 17, 2015 in the House:
- Public hearing in the House Committee on Judiciary at 10:00 AM.
On January 21, 2015 in the House:
- First reading, referred to Judiciary (Not Officially read and referred until adoption of Introduction report).
+ − Sponsors (9)
Type:
Primary Sponsor