+ − Summaries (2)
+ − Full Texts (2)
+ − Actions (14)
On March 10, 2016 in the House:
- By resolution, reintroduced and retained in present status.
On January 11, 2016 in the House:
- Referred to Business & Financial Services.
- Rules Committee relieved of further consideration.
- By resolution, reintroduced and retained in present status.
On June 28, 2015 in the House:
- By resolution, reintroduced and retained in present status.
On May 29, 2015 in the House:
- By resolution, reintroduced and retained in present status.
On April 29, 2015 in the House:
- By resolution, reintroduced and retained in present status.
On February 13, 2015 in the House:
- Referred to Rules 2 Review.
On February 11, 2015 in the House:
- Minority; do not pass.
- BFS - Majority; 1st substitute bill be substituted, do pass.
- BFS - Executive action taken by committee.
- Executive action taken in the House Committee on Business & Financial Services at 1:30 PM.
On February 3, 2015 in the House:
- Public hearing in the House Committee on Business & Financial Services at 8:00 AM.
On January 21, 2015 in the House:
- First reading, referred to Business & Financial Services (Not Officially read and referred until adoption of Introduction report).
+ − Sponsors (2)
Type:
Primary Sponsor