+ − Summaries (3)
+ − Full Texts (4)
+ − Actions (42)
On March 10, 2016 in the Senate:
- By resolution, reintroduced and retained in present status.
On January 11, 2016 in the Senate:
- Referred to Environment.
- Rules Committee relieved of further consideration.
- By resolution, reintroduced and retained in present status.
On July 9, 2015 in the Senate:
- Returned to House Rules 3.
On June 28, 2015 in the Senate:
- Rules Committee relieved of further consideration. Placed on third reading.
On June 27, 2015 in the Senate:
- Returned to Rules Committee for third reading.
On June 10, 2015 in the Senate:
- Rules Committee relieved of further consideration. Placed on third reading.
On May 29, 2015 in the Senate:
- By resolution, reintroduced and retained in present status.
On May 28, 2015 in the Senate:
- By resolution, returned to House Rules Committee for third reading.
On April 29, 2015 in the Senate:
- Rules Committee relieved of further consideration. Placed on third reading.
On April 24, 2015 in the Senate:
- By resolution, returned to House Rules Committee for third reading.
On April 7, 2015 in the Senate:
- Passed to Rules Committee for second reading.
- Minority; without recommendation.
- WM - Majority; do pass with amendment(s) by Energy, Environment & Telecommunications.
- Executive action taken in the Senate Committee on Ways & Means at 10:00 AM.
On April 1, 2015 in the Senate:
- Referred to Ways & Means.
- Minority; without recommendation.
- Minority; do not pass.
- And refer to Ways & Means.
- EET - Majority; do pass with amendment(s).
On March 31, 2015 in the Senate:
- Executive action taken in the Senate Committee on Energy and Environment & Telecommunications at 1:30 PM.
On March 25, 2015 in the Senate:
- Public hearing in the Senate Committee on Energy and Environment & Telecommunications at 1:30 PM.
On March 24, 2015 in the Senate:
- Public hearing in the Senate Committee on Energy and Environment & Telecommunications at 1:30 PM.
On March 13, 2015 in the Senate:
- First reading, referred to Energy, Environment & Telecommunications.
On March 11, 2015 in the House:
- Third reading, passed; yeas, 63; nays, 35; absent, 0; excused, 0.
- Rules suspended. Placed on Third Reading.
- Floor amendment(s) adopted.
- 2nd substitute bill substituted (APP 15).
On March 5, 2015 in the House:
- Rules Committee relieved of further consideration. Placed on second reading.
On February 27, 2015 in the House:
- Executive action taken in the House Committee on Appropriations at 9:00 AM.
- APP - Majority; 2nd substitute bill be substituted, do pass.
- Minority; do not pass.
- Minority; without recommendation.
- Referred to Rules 2 Review.
On February 26, 2015 in the House:
- Public hearing in the House Committee on Appropriations at 9:00 AM.
On February 19, 2015 in the House:
- Referred to Appropriations.
On February 17, 2015 in the House:
- Minority; do not pass.
- ENVI - Majority; 1st substitute bill be substituted, do pass.
- Executive action taken in the House Committee on Environment at 1:30 PM.
On February 2, 2015 in the House:
- Public hearing in the House Committee on Environment at 1:30 PM.
On January 21, 2015 in the House:
- First reading, referred to Environment (Not Officially read and referred until adoption of Introduction report).
+ − Amendments (17)
1472-S2.E AMH SHEA LIPS 311 (AMD 586 )
1472-S2.E AMH SHEA LIPS 311 (AMD 586 )
1472-S2 AMH SHEA H2314.1
WITHDRAWN 03/11/2015
1472-S2 AMH SHEA LIPS 253
FAILED 03/11/2015
1472-S2 AMH FITZ H2198.5
ADOPTED 03/11/2015
+ − Sponsors (13)
Type:
Primary Sponsor