+ − Summary
+ − Full Texts (3)
+ − Actions (22)
On May 3, 2013 in the Senate:
- Effective date 7/28/2013.
- Chapter 125, 2013 Laws.
- Governor signed.
On April 23, 2013 in the Senate:
- Delivered to Governor.
On April 19, 2013 in the Senate:
- President signed.
On April 18, 2013 in the Senate:
- Speaker signed.
On April 17, 2013 in the Senate:
- Third reading, passed; yeas, 48; nays, 0; absent, 0; excused, 1.
- Rules suspended. Placed on Third Reading.
On April 15, 2013 in the Senate:
- Placed on second reading by Rules Committee.
On March 28, 2013 in the Senate:
- Passed to Rules Committee for second reading.
- CL - Majority; do pass.
On March 27, 2013 in the Senate:
- Executive action taken in the Senate Committee on Commerce & Labor at 1:30 PM.
On March 20, 2013 in the Senate:
- Public hearing in the Senate Committee on Commerce & Labor at 1:30 PM.
On March 12, 2013 in the Senate:
- First reading, referred to Commerce & Labor.
On March 9, 2013 in the House:
- Third reading, passed; yeas, 97; nays, 0; absent, 0; excused, 1.
- Rules suspended. Placed on Third Reading.
On March 8, 2013 in the House:
- Rules Committee relieved of further consideration. Placed on second reading.
On February 7, 2013 in the House:
- Passed to Rules Committee for second reading.
On February 6, 2013 in the House:
- LWD - Majority; do pass.
- LWD - Executive action taken by committee.
- Public hearing and executive action taken in the House Committee on Labor & Workforce Development at 8:00 AM.
On January 28, 2013 in the House:
- First reading, referred to Labor & Workforce Development.
+ − Sponsors (8)
Type:
Primary Sponsor