+ − Full Texts (3)
+ − Actions (14)
On March 10, 2021 in the House:
- Returned to Rules Committee for second reading.
On February 25, 2021 in the House:
- Rules Committee relieved of further consideration. Placed on second reading.
On February 22, 2021 in the House:
- Referred to Rules 2 Review.
- Minority; without recommendation. (Minority Report)
- Minority; do not pass. (Minority Report)
- APP - Majority; 2nd substitute bill be substituted, do pass. (View 2nd Substitute) (Majority Report)
- Public hearing and executive action taken in the House Committee on Appropriations at 9:00 AM. (Committee Materials)
On February 18, 2021 in the House:
- Referred to Appropriations.
On February 17, 2021 in the House:
- Minority; without recommendation. (Minority Report)
- FIN - Majority; 1st substitute bill be substituted, do pass. (View 1st Substitute) (Majority Report)
- Executive action taken in the House Committee on Finance at 9:00 AM. (Committee Materials)
On February 16, 2021 in the House:
- Executive session scheduled, but no action was taken in the House Committee on Finance at 9:00 AM. (Committee Materials)
On February 8, 2021 in the House:
- Public hearing in the House Committee on Finance at 10:00 AM. (Committee Materials)
On February 2, 2021 in the House:
- First reading, referred to Finance. (View Original Bill)
+ − Sponsors (25)
Type:
Primary Sponsor