+ − Full Texts (2)
+ − Actions (18)
On April 25, 2021 in the Senate:
- By resolution, returned to House Rules Committee for third reading.
On March 31, 2021 in the Senate:
- Placed on second reading by Rules Committee.
On March 25, 2021 in the Senate:
- Passed to Rules Committee for second reading.
On March 24, 2021 in the Senate:
- Minority; do not pass. (Minority Report)
- SGE - Majority; do pass with amendment(s). (Majority Report)
- Executive action taken in the Senate Committee on State Government & Elections at 8:00 AM. (Committee Materials)
On March 17, 2021 in the Senate:
- Public hearing in the Senate Committee on State Government & Elections at 8:00 AM. (Committee Materials)
On March 6, 2021 in the Senate:
- First reading, referred to State Government & Elections.
On March 3, 2021 in the House:
- Floor amendment(s) adopted.
- Rules suspended. Placed on Third Reading.
- Third reading, passed; yeas, 90; nays, 7; absent, 0; excused, 1. (View 1st Engrossed) (View Roll Calls)
On March 2, 2021 in the House:
- Rules Committee relieved of further consideration. Placed on second reading.
On February 15, 2021 in the House:
- Referred to Rules 2 Review.
On February 11, 2021 in the House:
- Minority; without recommendation. (Minority Report)
- SGOV - Majority; do pass. (Majority Report)
- Executive action taken in the House Committee on State Government & Tribal Relations at 10:00 AM. (Committee Materials)
On February 8, 2021 in the House:
- Public hearing in the House Committee on State Government & Tribal Relations at 1:30 PM. (Committee Materials)
On February 2, 2021 in the House:
- First reading, referred to State Government & Tribal Relations. (View Original Bill)