+ − Full Texts (4)
+ − Actions (26)
On May 4, 2017 in the Senate:
- Effective date 7/23/2017.
- Chapter 166, 2017 Laws. (View Session Law)
- Governor signed.
On April 20, 2017 in the Senate:
- Delivered to Governor. (View Bill as Passed Legislature)
On April 19, 2017 in the Senate:
- President signed.
On April 18, 2017 in the House:
- Speaker signed.
On April 13, 2017 in the House:
- Passed final passage; yeas, 96; nays, 0; absent, 0; excused, 2. (View Roll Calls)
- House concurred in Senate amendments.
On April 6, 2017 in the Senate:
- Third reading, passed; yeas, 49; nays, 0; absent, 0; excused, 0. (View Roll Calls)
- Rules suspended. Placed on Third Reading.
- Committee amendment(s) adopted with no other amendments.
On April 5, 2017 in the Senate:
- Placed on second reading by Rules Committee.
On March 27, 2017 in the Senate:
- Passed to Rules Committee for second reading.
On March 23, 2017 in the Senate:
- EDU - Majority; do pass with amendment(s). (Majority Report)
- Executive action taken in the Senate Committee on Early Learning & K-12 Education at 1:30 PM. (Committee Materials)
On March 13, 2017 in the Senate:
- Public hearing in the Senate Committee on Early Learning & K-12 Education at 1:30 PM. (Committee Materials)
On March 3, 2017 in the Senate:
- First reading, referred to Early Learning & K-12 Education.
On March 1, 2017 in the House:
- Third reading, passed; yeas, 98; nays, 0; absent, 0; excused, 0. (View Roll Calls)
- Rules suspended. Placed on Third Reading.
- 1st substitute bill substituted (ED 17). (View 1st Substitute)
On February 28, 2017 in the House:
- Placed on second reading by Rules Committee.
On February 13, 2017 in the House:
- Referred to Rules 2 Review.
On February 9, 2017 in the House:
- ED - Majority; 1st substitute bill be substituted, do pass. (View 1st Substitute) (Majority Report)
- Executive action taken in the House Committee on Education at 8:00 AM. (Committee Materials)
On January 31, 2017 in the House:
- Public hearing in the House Committee on Education at 1:30 PM. (Committee Materials)
On January 20, 2017 in the House:
- First reading, referred to Education (Not Officially read and referred until adoption of Introduction report). (View Original Bill)
+ − Sponsors (9)
Type:
Primary Sponsor