+ − Summary
+ − Full Text
+ − Actions (21)
On March 10, 2016 in the House:
- By resolution, reintroduced and retained in present status.
On January 11, 2016 in the House:
- Rules Committee relieved of further consideration.
- By resolution, reintroduced and retained in present status.
- Referred to Health Care & Wellness.
On June 28, 2015 in the House:
- By resolution, reintroduced and retained in present status.
On May 29, 2015 in the House:
- By resolution, reintroduced and retained in present status.
On April 29, 2015 in the House:
- By resolution, reintroduced and retained in present status.
On March 13, 2015 in the House:
- Returned to Rules Committee for second reading.
On March 5, 2015 in the House:
- Rules Committee relieved of further consideration. Placed on second reading.
On February 27, 2015 in the House:
- Referred to Rules 2 Review.
On February 25, 2015 in the House:
- Executive action taken in the House Committee on Appropriations at 1:30 PM.
- Minority; do not pass.
- APP - Majority; do pass.
On February 18, 2015 in the House:
- Public hearing in the House Committee on Appropriations at 3:30 PM.
On February 6, 2015 in the House:
- Referred to Appropriations.
On February 3, 2015 in the House:
- Minority; do not pass.
- HCW - Majority; do pass.
- HCW - Executive action taken by committee.
- Executive action taken in the House Committee on Health Care & Wellness at 8:00 AM.
On January 30, 2015 in the House:
- Public hearing in the House Committee on Health Care & Wellness at 11:00 AM.
On January 21, 2015 in the House:
- First reading, referred to Health Care & Wellness (Not Officially read and referred until adoption of Introduction report).
+ − Sponsors (14)
Type:
Primary Sponsor