+ − Summary
+ − Full Text
+ − Actions (8)
On March 10, 2016 in the House:
- By resolution, reintroduced and retained in present status.
On January 11, 2016 in the House:
- By resolution, reintroduced and retained in present status.
On June 28, 2015 in the House:
- By resolution, reintroduced and retained in present status.
On May 29, 2015 in the House:
- By resolution, reintroduced and retained in present status.
On April 29, 2015 in the House:
- By resolution, reintroduced and retained in present status.
On February 16, 2015 in the House:
- Executive action scheduled, but the motion to report the bill out of the House Committee on Commerce & Gaming at 1:30 PM failed.
On January 27, 2015 in the House:
- Public hearing in the House Committee on Commerce & Gaming at 1:30 PM.
On January 20, 2015 in the House:
- First reading, referred to Commerce & Gaming (Not Officially read and referred until adoption of Introduction report).
+ − Sponsors (2)
Type:
Primary Sponsor