+ − Summaries (2)
+ − Full Texts (2)
+ − Actions (18)
On January 24, 2014 in the House:
- House Rules "X" file.
On January 13, 2014 in the House:
- By resolution, reintroduced and retained in present status.
On November 7, 2013 in the House:
- By resolution, reintroduced and retained in present status.
On May 13, 2013 in the House:
- By resolution, reintroduced and retained in present status.
On March 13, 2013 in the House:
- Returned to Rules Committee for second reading.
On March 7, 2013 in the House:
- Rules Committee relieved of further consideration. Placed on second reading.
On March 1, 2013 in the House:
- Passed to Rules Committee for second reading.
On February 28, 2013 in the House:
- Public hearing and executive action taken in the House Committee on Appropriations at 1:30 PM.
- APP - Executive action taken by committee.
- APP - Majority; do pass PS 13 bill proposed by Public Safety.
- Minority; do not pass.
On February 22, 2013 in the House:
- Referred to Appropriations.
On February 21, 2013 in the House:
- Minority; do not pass.
- PS - Majority; 1st substitute bill be substituted, do pass.
- PS - Executive action taken by committee.
- Executive action taken in the House Committee on Public Safety at 10:00 AM.
On February 20, 2013 in the House:
- Public hearing in the House Committee on Public Safety at 1:30 PM.
On January 25, 2013 in the House:
- First reading, referred to Public Safety.
+ − Sponsors (13)
Type:
Primary Sponsor