+ − Summaries (2)
+ − Full Texts (2)
+ − Actions (23)
On March 10, 2016 in the Senate:
- By resolution, reintroduced and retained in present status.
- By resolution, returned to House Rules Committee for third reading.
On February 25, 2016 in the Senate:
- Public hearing in the Senate Committee on Government Operations & Security at 10:00 AM.
On February 15, 2016 in the Senate:
- First reading, referred to Government Operations & Security.
On February 11, 2016 in the Senate:
- Third reading, passed; yeas, 63; nays, 33; absent, 0; excused, 1.
On January 28, 2016 in the Senate:
- Placed on third reading by Rules Committee.
On January 11, 2016 in the Senate:
- By resolution, reintroduced and retained in present status.
On June 28, 2015 in the Senate:
- By resolution, reintroduced and retained in present status.
On May 29, 2015 in the Senate:
- By resolution, reintroduced and retained in present status.
On April 29, 2015 in the Senate:
- By resolution, reintroduced and retained in present status.
On April 24, 2015 in the Senate:
- By resolution, returned to House Rules Committee for third reading.
On March 26, 2015 in the Senate:
- Public hearing in the Senate Committee on Government Operations & Security at 10:00 AM.
On March 6, 2015 in the Senate:
- First reading, referred to Government Operations & Security.
On March 4, 2015 in the House:
- Third reading, passed; yeas, 60; nays, 38; absent, 0; excused, 0.
- Rules suspended. Placed on Third Reading.
- 1st substitute bill substituted (SG 15).
On February 27, 2015 in the House:
- Placed on second reading by Rules Committee.
On February 16, 2015 in the House:
- Referred to Rules 2 Review.
On February 11, 2015 in the House:
- SG - Majority; 1st substitute bill be substituted, do pass.
- SG - Executive action taken by committee.
- Executive action taken in the House Committee on State Government at 8:00 AM.
On January 29, 2015 in the House:
- Public hearing in the House Committee on State Government at 1:30 PM.
On January 20, 2015 in the House:
- First reading, referred to State Government (Not Officially read and referred until adoption of Introduction report).
+ − Amendment
1428-S AMH YOUN H2203.1
FAILED 03/04/2015
+ − Sponsors (8)
Type:
Primary Sponsor