+ − Summary
+ − Full Text
+ − Actions (6)
On January 13, 2014 in the House:
- Referred to Technology & Economic Development.
- By resolution, reintroduced and retained in present status.
On November 7, 2013 in the House:
- By resolution, reintroduced and retained in present status.
On May 13, 2013 in the House:
- By resolution, reintroduced and retained in present status.
On February 5, 2013 in the House:
- Public hearing in the House Committee on Environment at 8:00 AM.
On January 25, 2013 in the House:
- First reading, referred to Environment.