+ − Full Texts (2)
+ − Actions (10)
On January 8, 2018 in the House:
- By resolution, reintroduced and retained in present status.
On June 21, 2017 in the House:
- By resolution, reintroduced and retained in present status.
On May 23, 2017 in the House:
- By resolution, reintroduced and retained in present status.
On April 24, 2017 in the House:
- By resolution, reintroduced and retained in present status.
On February 17, 2017 in the House:
- Referred to Appropriations.
On February 15, 2017 in the House:
- HE - Majority; 1st substitute bill be substituted, do pass. (View 1st Substitute) (Majority Report)
- Executive action taken in the House Committee on Higher Education at 1:30 PM. (Committee Materials)
On February 14, 2017 in the House:
- Executive session scheduled, but no action was taken in the House Committee on Higher Education at 8:00 AM. (Committee Materials)
On February 1, 2017 in the House:
- Public hearing in the House Committee on Higher Education at 1:30 PM. (Committee Materials)
On January 19, 2017 in the House:
- First reading, referred to Higher Education (Not Officially read and referred until adoption of Introduction report). (View Original Bill)
+ − Sponsors (22)
Type:
Primary Sponsor