+ − Full Texts (8)
+ − Actions (55)
On March 31, 2022 in the Senate:
- Effective date 1/1/2023.
- Chapter 260, 2022 Laws. (View Session Law)
- Governor signed.
On March 10, 2022 in the Senate:
- Delivered to Governor. (View Bill as Passed Legislature)
- President signed.
On March 10, 2022 in the House:
- Speaker signed.
On March 9, 2022 in the House:
- Passed final passage; yeas, 64; nays, 32; absent, 0; excused, 2. (View Roll Calls)
- House concurred in Senate amendments.
On March 3, 2022 in the Senate:
- Third reading, passed; yeas, 38; nays, 11; absent, 0; excused, 0. (View Roll Calls)
- Rules suspended. Placed on Third Reading.
- Committee amendment(s) adopted with no other amendments.
On March 2, 2022 in the Senate:
- Placed on second reading by Rules Committee.
On February 28, 2022 in the Senate:
- Executive action taken in the Senate Committee on Ways & Means at 10:00 AM. (Committee Materials)
- Minority; do not pass. (Minority Report)
- WM - Majority; do pass with amendment(s). (Majority Report)
- Passed to Rules Committee for second reading.
On February 26, 2022 in the Senate:
- Public hearing in the Senate Committee on Ways & Means at 9:00 AM. (Committee Materials)
On February 24, 2022 in the Senate:
- Referred to Ways & Means.
- And refer to Ways & Means.
- Minority; without recommendation. (Minority Report)
- Minority; do not pass. (Minority Report)
- LAW - Majority; do pass with amendment(s). (Majority Report)
- Executive action taken in the Senate Committee on Law & Justice at 10:30 AM. (Committee Materials)
On February 17, 2022 in the Senate:
- Public hearing in the Senate Committee on Law & Justice at 10:30 AM. (Committee Materials)
On February 12, 2022 in the Senate:
- First reading, referred to Law & Justice.
On February 10, 2022 in the House:
- 4th substitute bill substituted (APP 22). (View 4th Substitute)
- Floor amendment(s) adopted.
- Rules suspended. Placed on Third Reading.
- Third reading, passed; yeas, 70; nays, 24; absent, 0; excused, 4. (View 1st Engrossed) (View Roll Calls)
On February 7, 2022 in the House:
- Rules Committee relieved of further consideration. Placed on second reading.
On February 3, 2022 in the House:
- Referred to Rules 2 Review.
On February 1, 2022 in the House:
- Minority; without recommendation. (Minority Report)
- APP - Majority; 4th substitute bill be substituted, do pass. (View 4th Substitute) (Majority Report)
- Executive action taken in the House Committee on Appropriations at 3:30 PM. (Committee Materials)
On January 25, 2022 in the House:
- Public hearing in the House Committee on Appropriations at 3:30 PM. (Committee Materials)
On January 18, 2022 in the House:
- Referred to Appropriations.
On January 14, 2022 in the House:
- Minority; do not pass. (Minority Report)
- CRJ - Majority; 3rd substitute bill be substituted, do pass. (View 3rd Substitute) (Majority Report)
- Executive action taken in the House Committee on Civil Rights & Judiciary at 8:00 AM. (Committee Materials)
On January 11, 2022 in the House:
- Public hearing in the House Committee on Civil Rights & Judiciary at 10:00 AM. (Committee Materials)
On January 10, 2022 in the House:
- Rules Committee relieved of further consideration.
- Referred to Civil Rights & Judiciary.
On February 22, 2021 in the House:
- Referred to Rules 2 Review.
- Minority; without recommendation. (Minority Report)
- Minority; do not pass. (Minority Report)
- APP - Majority; 2nd substitute bill be substituted, do pass. (View 2nd Substitute) (Majority Report)
- Executive action taken in the House Committee on Appropriations at 9:00 AM. (Committee Materials)
On February 19, 2021 in the House:
- Public hearing in the House Committee on Appropriations at 1:30 PM. (Committee Materials)
On February 12, 2021 in the House:
- Referred to Appropriations.
On February 10, 2021 in the House:
- Minority; do not pass. (Minority Report)
- CRJ - Majority; 1st substitute bill be substituted, do pass. (View 1st Substitute) (Majority Report)
- Executive action taken in the House Committee on Civil Rights & Judiciary at 10:00 AM. (Committee Materials)
On February 5, 2021 in the House:
- Executive session scheduled, but no action was taken in the House Committee on Civil Rights & Judiciary at 8:00 AM. (Committee Materials)
On February 3, 2021 in the House:
- Public hearing in the House Committee on Civil Rights & Judiciary at 10:00 AM. (Committee Materials)
On January 28, 2021 in the House:
- First reading, referred to Civil Rights & Judiciary. (View Original Bill)
+ − Sponsors (11)
Type:
Primary Sponsor