+ − Summaries (2)
+ − Full Texts (5)
+ − Actions (25)
On April 29, 2015 in the Senate:
- Effective date 7/24/2015.
- Chapter 136, 2015 Laws.
- Governor signed.
On April 21, 2015 in the Senate:
- Delivered to Governor.
On April 17, 2015 in the Senate:
- President signed.
On April 16, 2015 in the Senate:
- Speaker signed.
On April 13, 2015 in the Senate:
- Third reading, passed; yeas, 41; nays, 5; absent, 0; excused, 3.
- Rules suspended. Placed on Third Reading.
On April 8, 2015 in the Senate:
- Placed on second reading by Rules Committee.
On March 25, 2015 in the Senate:
- Passed to Rules Committee for second reading.
- GOS - Majority; do pass.
On March 24, 2015 in the Senate:
- Executive action taken in the Senate Committee on Government Operations & Security at 10:00 AM.
On March 12, 2015 in the Senate:
- Public hearing in the Senate Committee on Government Operations & Security at 10:00 AM.
On March 5, 2015 in the Senate:
- First reading, referred to Government Operations & Security.
On March 3, 2015 in the House:
- Third reading, passed; yeas, 97; nays, 0; absent, 0; excused, 1.
- Rules suspended. Placed on Third Reading.
- Floor amendment(s) adopted.
- 1st substitute bill substituted (LG 15).
On February 27, 2015 in the House:
- Placed on second reading by Rules Committee.
On February 9, 2015 in the House:
- Referred to Rules 2 Review.
On February 5, 2015 in the House:
- LG - Majority; 1st substitute bill be substituted, do pass.
- LG - Executive action taken by committee.
- Executive action taken in the House Committee on Local Government at 1:30 PM.
On January 29, 2015 in the House:
- Public hearing in the House Committee on Local Government at 1:30 PM.
On January 20, 2015 in the House:
- First reading, referred to Local Government (Not Officially read and referred until adoption of Introduction report).
+ − Amendment
1410-S AMH TAKK MURD 153
ADOPTED 03/03/2015