+ − Summaries (3)
+ − Full Texts (5)
+ − Actions (43)
On March 31, 2016 in the Senate:
- Effective date 6/9/2016.
- Chapter 79, 2016 Laws.
- Governor signed.
On March 10, 2016 in the Senate:
- Delivered to Governor.
On March 9, 2016 in the Senate:
- President signed.
- Speaker signed.
On March 4, 2016 in the Senate:
- Third reading, passed; yeas, 43; nays, 3; absent, 0; excused, 3.
- Rules suspended. Placed on Third Reading.
On March 2, 2016 in the Senate:
- Placed on second reading by Rules Committee.
On February 26, 2016 in the Senate:
- Passed to Rules Committee for second reading.
On February 25, 2016 in the Senate:
- EDU - Majority; do pass.
- Executive action taken in the Senate Committee on Early Learning & K-12 Education at 8:00 AM.
On February 23, 2016 in the Senate:
- Public hearing in the Senate Committee on Early Learning & K-12 Education at 1:30 PM.
On January 29, 2016 in the Senate:
- First reading, referred to Early Learning & K-12 Education.
On January 27, 2016 in the Senate:
- Third reading, passed; yeas, 77; nays, 20; absent, 0; excused, 1.
- Rules suspended. Placed on Third Reading.
- 2nd substitute bill substituted (ED 16).
On January 22, 2016 in the Senate:
- Rules Committee relieved of further consideration. Placed on second reading.
On January 19, 2016 in the Senate:
- Referred to Rules 2 Review.
On January 14, 2016 in the Senate:
- Executive action taken in the House Committee on Education at 8:00 AM.
- ED - Majority; 2nd substitute bill be substituted, do pass.
- Minority; do not pass.
- Minority; without recommendation.
On January 11, 2016 in the Senate:
- Referred to Education.
- Rules Committee relieved of further consideration.
- By resolution, reintroduced and retained in present status.
- Public hearing in the House Committee on Education at 1:30 PM.
On June 28, 2015 in the Senate:
- By resolution, reintroduced and retained in present status.
On May 29, 2015 in the Senate:
- By resolution, reintroduced and retained in present status.
On April 29, 2015 in the Senate:
- By resolution, reintroduced and retained in present status.
On April 24, 2015 in the Senate:
- By resolution, returned to House Rules Committee for third reading.
On March 17, 2015 in the Senate:
- Public hearing in the Senate Committee on Early Learning & K-12 Education at 1:30 PM.
On March 4, 2015 in the Senate:
- First reading, referred to Early Learning & K-12 Education.
On March 2, 2015 in the House:
- Third reading, passed; yeas, 88; nays, 9; absent, 0; excused, 1.
- Rules suspended. Placed on Third Reading.
- 1st substitute bill substituted (ED 15).
On February 27, 2015 in the House:
- Placed on second reading by Rules Committee.
On February 20, 2015 in the House:
- Referred to Rules 2 Review.
On February 19, 2015 in the House:
- Minority; without recommendation.
- ED - Majority; 1st substitute bill be substituted, do pass.
- Executive action taken in the House Committee on Education at 8:00 AM.
On February 2, 2015 in the House:
- Public hearing in the House Committee on Education at 1:30 PM.
On January 20, 2015 in the House:
- First reading, referred to Education (Not Officially read and referred until adoption of Introduction report).
+ − Sponsors (10)
Type:
Primary Sponsor