+ − Summary
+ − Full Text
+ − Actions (5)
On January 13, 2014 in the House:
- By resolution, reintroduced and retained in present status.
On November 7, 2013 in the House:
- By resolution, reintroduced and retained in present status.
On May 13, 2013 in the House:
- By resolution, reintroduced and retained in present status.
On February 11, 2013 in the House:
- Public hearing in the House Committee on Appropriations at 3:30 PM.
On January 25, 2013 in the House:
- First reading, referred to Appropriations.
+ − Sponsors (8)
Type:
Primary Sponsor