+ − Summaries (2)
+ − Full Texts (5)
+ − Actions (25)
On May 1, 2013 in the Senate:
- Effective date 7/28/2013.
- Chapter 109, 2013 Laws.
- Governor signed.
On April 23, 2013 in the Senate:
- Delivered to Governor.
On April 19, 2013 in the Senate:
- President signed.
On April 18, 2013 in the Senate:
- Speaker signed.
On April 17, 2013 in the Senate:
- Third reading, passed; yeas, 47; nays, 1; absent, 0; excused, 1.
- Rules suspended. Placed on Third Reading.
On April 15, 2013 in the Senate:
- Placed on second reading by Rules Committee.
On March 29, 2013 in the Senate:
- Passed to Rules Committee for second reading.
- HLTH - Majority; do pass.
On March 28, 2013 in the Senate:
- Executive action taken in the Senate Committee on Health Care at 10:00 AM.
On March 26, 2013 in the Senate:
- Public hearing in the Senate Committee on Health Care at 10:00 AM.
On March 13, 2013 in the Senate:
- First reading, referred to Health Care.
On March 11, 2013 in the House:
- Third reading, passed; yeas, 97; nays, 0; absent, 0; excused, 1.
- Rules suspended. Placed on Third Reading.
- Floor amendment(s) adopted.
- 1st substitute bill substituted (OVER 13).
On March 9, 2013 in the House:
- Rules Committee relieved of further consideration. Placed on second reading.
On February 22, 2013 in the House:
- Passed to Rules Committee for second reading.
On February 21, 2013 in the House:
- OVER - Majority; 1st substitute bill be substituted, do pass.
- OVER - Executive action taken by committee.
- Executive action taken in the House Committee on Government Accountability & Oversight at 8:30 AM.
On February 5, 2013 in the House:
- Public hearing in the House Committee on Government Accountability & Oversight at 1:30 PM.
On January 24, 2013 in the House:
- First reading, referred to Government Accountability & Oversight.
+ − Amendment
1381-S AMH JINK OSBO 069
ADOPTED 03/11/2013
+ − Sponsors (11)
Type:
Primary Sponsor