+ − Summaries (2)
+ − Full Texts (2)
+ − Actions (12)
On March 10, 2016 in the House:
- By resolution, reintroduced and retained in present status.
On January 11, 2016 in the House:
- By resolution, reintroduced and retained in present status.
On June 28, 2015 in the House:
- By resolution, reintroduced and retained in present status.
On May 29, 2015 in the House:
- By resolution, reintroduced and retained in present status.
On April 29, 2015 in the House:
- By resolution, reintroduced and retained in present status.
On March 4, 2015 in the House:
- House Rules "X" file.
On February 27, 2015 in the House:
- Placed on second reading by Rules Committee.
On February 20, 2015 in the House:
- Referred to Rules 2 Review.
On February 16, 2015 in the House:
- COG - Majority; 1st substitute bill be substituted, do pass.
- Executive action taken in the House Committee on Commerce & Gaming at 1:30 PM.
On January 27, 2015 in the House:
- Public hearing in the House Committee on Commerce & Gaming at 1:30 PM.
On January 19, 2015 in the House:
- First reading, referred to Commerce & Gaming (Not Officially read and referred until adoption of Introduction report).