+ − Summaries (2)
+ − Full Texts (2)
+ − Actions (9)
On January 13, 2014 in the House:
- By resolution, reintroduced and retained in present status.
On November 7, 2013 in the House:
- By resolution, reintroduced and retained in present status.
On May 13, 2013 in the House:
- By resolution, reintroduced and retained in present status.
On February 18, 2013 in the House:
- Passed to Rules Committee for second reading.
On February 14, 2013 in the House:
- GOE - Majority; 1st substitute bill be substituted, do pass.
- GOE - Executive action taken by committee.
- Executive action taken in the House Committee on Government Operations & Elections at 10:00 AM.
On February 7, 2013 in the House:
- Public hearing in the House Committee on Government Operations & Elections at 10:00 AM.
On January 24, 2013 in the House:
- First reading, referred to Government Operations & Elections.