+ − Full Texts (5)
+ − Actions (65)
On March 22, 2018 in the Senate:
- Effective date 6/7/2018.
- Chapter 200, 2018 Laws. (View Session Law)
- Governor signed.
On March 8, 2018 in the Senate:
- Delivered to Governor. (View Bill as Passed Legislature)
- President signed.
On March 8, 2018 in the House:
- Speaker signed.
On March 5, 2018 in the House:
- Passed final passage; yeas, 64; nays, 34; absent, 0; excused, 0. (View Roll Calls)
- House concurred in Senate amendments.
On February 28, 2018 in the Senate:
- Third reading, passed; yeas, 43; nays, 3; absent, 0; excused, 3. (View Roll Calls)
- Rules suspended. Placed on Third Reading.
- Committee amendment(s) adopted with no other amendments.
- Placed on second reading by Rules Committee.
On February 26, 2018 in the Senate:
- Passed to Rules Committee for second reading.
- Minority; without recommendation. (Minority Report)
- WM - Majority; do pass with amendment(s) by Ways & Means. (Majority Report)
- Executive action taken in the Senate Committee on Ways & Means at 10:00 AM. (Committee Materials)
On February 24, 2018 in the Senate:
- Public hearing in the Senate Committee on Ways & Means at 9:00 AM. (Committee Materials)
On February 22, 2018 in the Senate:
- Referred to Ways & Means.
On February 20, 2018 in the Senate:
- Minority; without recommendation. (Minority Report)
- And refer to Ways & Means.
- EDU - Majority; do pass. (Majority Report)
- Executive action taken in the Senate Committee on Early Learning & K-12 Education at 1:30 PM. (Committee Materials)
On February 19, 2018 in the Senate:
- Public hearing in the Senate Committee on Early Learning & K-12 Education at 1:30 PM. (Committee Materials)
On February 13, 2018 in the Senate:
- First reading, referred to Early Learning & K-12 Education.
On February 9, 2018 in the House:
- Third reading, passed; yeas, 64; nays, 34; absent, 0; excused, 0. (View Roll Calls)
- Rules suspended. Placed on Third Reading.
- 2nd substitute bill substituted (ED 18). (View 2nd Substitute)
On February 8, 2018 in the House:
- Rules Committee relieved of further consideration. Placed on second reading.
On February 6, 2018 in the House:
- Referred to Rules 2 Review.
- Minority; do not pass. (Minority Report)
- APP - Majority; do pass 2nd substitute bill proposed by Education. (Majority Report)
- Executive action taken in the House Committee on Appropriations at 10:00 AM. (Committee Materials)
On January 31, 2018 in the House:
- Public hearing in the House Committee on Appropriations at 3:30 PM. (Committee Materials)
On January 15, 2018 in the House:
- Referred to Appropriations.
On January 11, 2018 in the House:
- Minority; do not pass. (Minority Report)
- ED - Majority; 2nd substitute bill be substituted, do pass. (View 2nd Substitute) (Majority Report)
- Executive action taken in the House Committee on Education at 8:00 AM. (Committee Materials)
On January 9, 2018 in the House:
- Public hearing in the House Committee on Education at 1:30 PM. (Committee Materials)
On January 8, 2018 in the House:
- Referred to Education.
- Rules Committee relieved of further consideration.
- By resolution, reintroduced and retained in present status.
On June 21, 2017 in the House:
- By resolution, reintroduced and retained in present status.
On May 23, 2017 in the House:
- By resolution, reintroduced and retained in present status.
On April 24, 2017 in the House:
- By resolution, reintroduced and retained in present status.
On April 23, 2017 in the Senate:
- By resolution, returned to House Rules Committee for third reading.
On March 30, 2017 in the Senate:
- Public hearing in the Senate Committee on Ways & Means at 1:30 PM. (Committee Materials)
On March 29, 2017 in the Senate:
- Referred to Ways & Means.
On March 28, 2017 in the Senate:
- Executive action taken in the Senate Committee on Early Learning & K-12 Education at 1:30 PM. (Committee Materials)
- EDU - Majority; do pass with amendment(s). (Majority Report)
- And refer to Ways & Means.
On March 27, 2017 in the Senate:
- Public hearing in the Senate Committee on Early Learning & K-12 Education at 1:30 PM. (Committee Materials)
On March 9, 2017 in the Senate:
- First reading, referred to Early Learning & K-12 Education.
On March 7, 2017 in the House:
- Third reading, passed; yeas, 57; nays, 40; absent, 0; excused, 1. (View Roll Calls)
- Rules suspended. Placed on Third Reading.
- 1st substitute bill substituted (ED 17). (View 1st Substitute)
On March 6, 2017 in the House:
- Rules Committee relieved of further consideration. Placed on second reading.
On February 24, 2017 in the House:
- Referred to Rules 2 Review.
- Committee relieved of further consideration.
On February 13, 2017 in the House:
- Referred to Appropriations.
On February 9, 2017 in the House:
- Minority; without recommendation. (Minority Report)
- Minority; do not pass. (Minority Report)
- ED - Majority; 1st substitute bill be substituted, do pass. (View 1st Substitute) (Majority Report)
- Executive action taken in the House Committee on Education at 8:00 AM. (Committee Materials)
On February 2, 2017 in the House:
- Public hearing in the House Committee on Education at 8:00 AM. (Committee Materials)
On January 18, 2017 in the House:
- First reading, referred to Education (Not Officially read and referred until adoption of Introduction report). (View Original Bill)
+ − Sponsors (12)
Type:
Primary Sponsor