+ − Full Texts (3)
+ − Actions (26)
On May 7, 2019 in the Senate:
- Effective date 7/28/2019.
- Chapter 260, 2019 Laws. (View Session Law)
- Governor signed.
On April 26, 2019 in the Senate:
- Delivered to Governor. (View Bill as Passed Legislature)
On April 25, 2019 in the Senate:
- President signed.
On April 23, 2019 in the House:
- Speaker signed.
On April 18, 2019 in the House:
- Passed final passage; yeas, 78; nays, 16; absent, 0; excused, 4. (View Roll Calls)
- House concurred in Senate amendments.
On April 12, 2019 in the Senate:
- Third reading, passed; yeas, 36; nays, 5; absent, 0; excused, 8. (View Roll Calls)
- Rules suspended. Placed on Third Reading.
- Committee amendment(s) adopted with no other amendments.
On April 2, 2019 in the Senate:
- Placed on second reading by Rules Committee.
On March 20, 2019 in the Senate:
- Passed to Rules Committee for second reading.
On March 19, 2019 in the Senate:
- LGOV - Majority; do pass with amendment(s). (Majority Report)
- Executive action taken in the Senate Committee on Local Government at 8:00 AM. (Committee Materials)
On March 14, 2019 in the Senate:
- Public hearing in the Senate Committee on Local Government at 8:00 AM. (Committee Materials)
On March 5, 2019 in the Senate:
- First reading, referred to Local Government.
On March 1, 2019 in the House:
- Third reading, passed; yeas, 80; nays, 14; absent, 0; excused, 4. (View Roll Calls)
- Rules suspended. Placed on Third Reading.
On February 28, 2019 in the House:
- Placed on second reading by Rules Committee.
On February 7, 2019 in the House:
- Referred to Rules 2 Review.
On February 6, 2019 in the House:
- Minority; do not pass. (Minority Report)
- LG - Majority; do pass. (Majority Report)
- Executive action taken in the House Committee on Local Government at 8:00 AM. (Committee Materials)
On January 29, 2019 in the House:
- Public hearing in the House Committee on Local Government at 10:00 AM. (Committee Materials)
On January 21, 2019 in the House:
- First reading, referred to Local Government. (View Original Bill)