+ − Summary
+ − Full Text
+ − Actions (8)
On March 10, 2016 in the House:
- By resolution, reintroduced and retained in present status.
On January 11, 2016 in the House:
- By resolution, reintroduced and retained in present status.
On June 28, 2015 in the House:
- By resolution, reintroduced and retained in present status.
On May 29, 2015 in the House:
- By resolution, reintroduced and retained in present status.
On April 29, 2015 in the House:
- By resolution, reintroduced and retained in present status.
On February 17, 2015 in the House:
- Executive session scheduled, but no action was taken in the House Committee on Education at 1:30 PM.
On February 3, 2015 in the House:
- Public hearing in the House Committee on Education at 1:30 PM.
On January 19, 2015 in the House:
- First reading, referred to Education (Not Officially read and referred until adoption of Introduction report).
+ − Sponsors (21)
Type:
Primary Sponsor