+ − Summary
+ − Full Text
+ − Actions (16)
On January 13, 2014 in the Senate:
- By resolution, reintroduced and retained in present status.
On November 7, 2013 in the Senate:
- By resolution, reintroduced and retained in present status.
On May 13, 2013 in the Senate:
- By resolution, reintroduced and retained in present status.
On April 28, 2013 in the Senate:
- By resolution, returned to House Rules Committee for third reading.
On March 7, 2013 in the Senate:
- First reading, referred to Governmental Operations.
On March 5, 2013 in the House:
- Third reading, passed; yeas, 52; nays, 44; absent, 0; excused, 2.
- Rules suspended. Placed on Third Reading.
On March 1, 2013 in the House:
- Rules Committee relieved of further consideration. Placed on second reading.
On February 22, 2013 in the House:
- Made eligible to be placed on second reading.
On February 18, 2013 in the House:
- Passed to Rules Committee for second reading.
On February 14, 2013 in the House:
- Minority; do not pass.
- GOE - Majority; do pass.
- GOE - Executive action taken by committee.
- Executive action taken in the House Committee on Government Operations & Elections at 10:00 AM.
On February 6, 2013 in the House:
- Public hearing in the House Committee on Government Operations & Elections at 1:30 PM.
On January 24, 2013 in the House:
- First reading, referred to Government Operations & Elections.