+ − Full Texts (2)
+ − Actions (6)
On January 13, 2020 in the House:
- By resolution, reintroduced and retained in present status.
On February 6, 2019 in the House:
- Referred to Finance.
On February 1, 2019 in the House:
- RDAN - Majority; 1st substitute bill be substituted, do pass. (View 1st Substitute) (Majority Report)
- Executive action taken in the House Committee on Rural Development, Agriculture, & Natural Resources at 10:00 AM. (Committee Materials)
On January 30, 2019 in the House:
- Public hearing in the House Committee on Rural Development, Agriculture, & Natural Resources at 8:00 AM. (Committee Materials)
On January 21, 2019 in the House:
- First reading, referred to Rural Development, Agriculture, & Natural Resources. (View Original Bill)